IL SR1717 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes the historic significance of the 70th anniversary of the reestablishment of the sovereign and independent state of Israel as a homeland for the Jewish people. Reaffirms the bonds of friendship and cooperation which have existed between the United States, Illinois, and Israel for the past 70 years, and commits to strengthening those bonds. Commends the people of Israel for their remarkable achievements in building a new state and a pluralistic, democratic society in the face of terrorism, as well as hostility, ostracism, and belligerence from many of their neighbors. Reaffirms our support for Israel's right to defend itself against threats to its security and existence. Reaffirms our enduring support for Israel as Israel pursues peace with its neighbors. Extends the warmest congratulations and best wishes to the state of Israel and Israeli people for a peaceful and prosperous future.
Title
SUPPORT ISRAEL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1717&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR1717.htm |