IL SR1701 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Congress not to enact any law that would prevent individuals with pre-existing conditions from having access to affordable health care.
Title
ACA-PRE-EXISTING CONDITIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1701&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR1701.htm |