IL SR1692 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes Senator Michael Frerichs as he prepares to serve as Illinois' next State Treasurer.
Title
RECOGNZE - SEN. M. FRERICHS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2015-01-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions December 4, 2014 |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Co-Sponsor All Senators |
2014-12-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1692&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SR/09800SR1692.htm |