IL SR1595 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges all citizens to visit cancerscreenweek.org for cancer screening resources and talk to their healthcare providers about their risk factors for all cancer types including, but not limited to, breast, cervical, colon, lung, prostate, and skin cancers and recommended screening options. Declares the first week of December of 2018 as "Cancer Screen Week".
Title
CANCER SCREEN WEEK
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1595&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SR/10000SR1595.htm |