IL SR1173 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes and supports Lao veterans of the Vietnam War, supports and applauds Governor Quinn's proclamation naming July 19, 2014 as Lao Veterans Memorial Day, urges elected officials and the Department of Veterans' Affairs to work together to achieve burial rights for Lao American veterans in Illinois, urges educators to discuss the "Secret War" when talking about Vietnam War history, and commits to exploring ways to develop an Asian American social science history curriculum for public schools.
Title
LAO VETS-VIETNAM WAR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2014-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 27, 2014 |
2014-05-26 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 010-000-000 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1173&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SR/09800SR1173.htm |