IL SR1145 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-19 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizes and honors Loren Duke Abdalla on his heroic actions during World War II and urges that President Obama and Senator Richard Durbin take the steps necessary for him to receive the Medal of Honor.
Title
LOREN ABDALLA - MED OF HONOR
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 19, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-000 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1145&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SR/09800SR1145.htm |