IL SR1024 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the High-Quality Early Childhood Care and Education Advisory Committee to recommend ways to enroll more children and families in high-quality care and education programs.
Title
EARLY CHILDHOOD COMMITTEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(c-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 5, 2020 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Be Adopted Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |