IL SR0900 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Professional Review Panel and Illinois State Board of Education to conduct the rigorous analysis and financial modeling required to evaluate the potential value, impact, and financial implications of implementing the findings in the PRP Ad-Hoc Committee's report related to adjusting the Evidence-Based Funding formula's calculations in order to more accurately reflect the costs of supporting students exposed to trauma and living in concentrated poverty (Charge B) as well as to close racial equity gaps in opportunity and outcomes (Charges C and H) by November 30, 2022. Calls on the Professional Review Panel to complete the study and development of findings related to re-enrolling students who have dropped out of school by the extended deadline included within the PRP Ad-Hoc Committee report of December 31, 2022. Urges the Illinois State Board of Education to complete their revision of the district spending plans template and requirements and annually make all districts' spending plans publicly available on the Illinois State Board of Education's website starting with Fiscal Year 2023 by January 2023.
Title
REVIEW PANEL/ISBE-REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 5, 2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Be Adopted Education; 013-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |