IL SR0872 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the week of May 1, 2022 as Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week. Encourages the citizens of Illinois to become better informed about Tardive Dyskinesia.
Title
TARDIVE DYSKINESIA WEEK
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Be Adopted Healthcare Access and Availability; 006-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to Healthcare Access and Availability |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=872&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0872.htm |