IL SR0802 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 2024 as Child Abuse Prevention Month.
Title
CHILD ABUSE PREVENTION MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 005-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=802&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SR/10300SR0802.htm |