IL SR0774 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-09 - Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the Performance Evaluation Advisory Council (PEAC) to initiate and complete a research study into the implementation of teacher evaluation in Illinois, gather feedback from stakeholders state-wide, review best practice from other states, and use that research to inform a set of policy recommendations that would address any identified challenges while preserving the core benefits of PERA's robust evaluation system with an interim report to the legislature by December 31, 2022 that includes a full timeline for report creation, including a plan for gathering stakeholder feedback, with a final report to be given to the legislature by December 31, 2023. Further urges the PEAC convene to initiate discussion on this charge by April 30, 2022.
Title
URGES-PEAC RESEARCH STUDY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 23, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended Education; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |