IL SR0773 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the date of August 27, 2012 as Taiwan Relations Day in the State of Illinois in recognition of the 20th anniversary of Illinois sister statehood with the Republic of China (Taiwan). Recognizes the Republic of China (Taiwan) on its successful presidential and parliamentary elections, the re-election to a second term of President Ma Ying-jeou, and on the 20th anniversary of its participation in the Asia-Pacific Economic Cooperation (APEC) forum to increase Taiwan's international space and contribution to the global community. Affirms support for the meaningful participation of Taiwan in the United Nations Framework Convention on Climate Change (UNFCCC) and the International Civil Aviation Organization (ICAO) with observer status.
Title
TAIWAN RELATIONS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=773&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SR/09700SR0773.htm |