IL SR0735 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 22, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares May 5-11, 2024 as Tardive Dyskinesia Awareness Week. Encourages anyone experiencing uncontrollable, abnormal, and repetitive movements to consult their healthcare provider regarding their symptoms.
Title
TARDIVE DYSKINESIA WEEK
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 22, 2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=735&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SR/10300SR0735.htm |