IL SR0342 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-31 - Resolution Adopted as Amended 039-009-010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-31 - Resolution Adopted as Amended 039-009-010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
States opposition to the proposed change of the Determination of Need Score minimum threshold from 29 to 37, which would result in thousands of people with disabilities and seniors being left without critical support for activities of daily living in their own homes. Urges the Governor and the Illinois Department of Human Services to withdraw any and all plans to amend the Medicaid State plan to change the Determination of Need score requirements.
Title
OPPOSE DNS SCORE CHANGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-31 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-31 | Senate | Resolution Adopted as Amended 039-009-010 |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Kotowski |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 005-000-001 |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Be Adopted Human Services; 006-000-002 |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |