IL SR0305 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Illinois long-term care facilities to uphold and adhere to federal and state laws, rules, regulations, and guidance on a resident's standards of care, rights, protections, and inalienable right to be treated with respect, dignity, and quality care.
Title
LONG-TERM CARE FACILITIES
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 30, 2021 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Be Adopted Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=305&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0305.htm |