IL SR0209 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares the month of April 2019 as Sikh Awareness & Appreciation Month in Illinois.
Title
SIKH APPRECIATION MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Be Adopted State Government; 005-000-000 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=209&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SR/10100SR0209.htm |