IL SR0105 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 19 to April 22, 2021 as Reduce, Reuse, Recycle Week.
Title
REDUCE REUSE RECYCLE WEEK
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] | Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] |
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Be Adopted Environment and Conservation; 009-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=105&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SR/10200SR0105.htm |