IL SR0084 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 7, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the State of Illinois to implement both a "Buy America" policy and a "Buy Illinois" policy, which would help grow the steel industry, create jobs, build the middle class, and protect American companies and workers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BUY AMERICAN/ILLINOIS STEEL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateBe Adopted Labor; 016-000-000
2019-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Labor
2019-02-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-06SenateFiled with Secretary

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback