IL SR0059 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Auditor General to conduct an audit of awards approved by the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission for claims filed by employees of Menard Correctional Center and arbitrators employed by the Commission from 2008 to the present.
Title
WORKERS COMPENSATION AUDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-07-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-10 | Senate | To Executive Subcommittee on State Government Operations; - 3/16/2011 - Postponed in Subcommittee / 3/17/2011 - Postponed in Regular Committee |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=59&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SR/09700SR0059.htm |