IL SJR0114 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages the General Assembly to promptly review and evaluate the Report on Waiver of School Code Mandates filed by the State Board of Education to determine if the Report should be disapproved in whole or in part.
Title
SCH CD MANDATE WAIVER REPORT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Adopted Both Houses | |
2010-04-29 | Resolution Adopted 096-015-001 | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions | |
2010-04-29 | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000 | |
2010-04-23 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-04-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-23 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2010-04-22 | Arrived in House | |
2010-04-22 | Resolution Adopted as Amended 049-000-000 | |
2010-04-22 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 21, 2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Be Adopted as Amended Education; 010-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James T. Meeks | |
2010-04-13 | Assigned to Education | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-17 | Filed with Secretary |