IL SJR0065 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the State of Illinois to remain a competitive workforce and an ideal State to bring new industry and new jobs by creating incentive programs that attract growth industries and smart jobs with a goal that incentive programs generate $2 of investment to Illinois for every dollar of incentive provided.
Title
COMPETITIVE WORKFORCE INCENTIV
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 1, 2012 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Be Adopted Revenue; 009-000-000 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=65&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SJR/09700SJ0065.htm |