IL SJR0058 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE ONE HUNDRED THIRD GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the Senate adjourns on Thursday, April 18, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 30, 2024, or to the call of the President; and when the House of Representatives adjourns on Friday, April 19, 2024, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, April 30, 2024, or to the call of the Speaker.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2024-04-19 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6a |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton; 3-6a |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=58&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SJR/10300SJ0058.htm |