IL SJR0056 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supports all efforts to make it easier for Americans in crisis to access potentially life-saving resources about suicide prevention, intervention, and mental health crisis by the Federal Communications Commission (FCC). Urges the FCC to establish a new hotline for those Americans experiencing suicidal thoughts or a mental health crisis. Further urges the FCC to initiate a rulemaking proceeding to consider designating 988 as the 3-digit code to be used for this purpose.
Title
SUPPORT-MENTAL HEALTH CRISIS
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Thomas Cullerton [D] | Sen. Antonio Munoz [D] |
Sen. Terry Link [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Be Adopted Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=56&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SJR/10100SJ0056.htm |