IL SJR0051 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Strives to protect and strengthen the Smoke Free Illinois Act. Urges the Illinois Department of Public Health to provide a data brief by 2023 on the impact of the Act since 2013 to commemorate the 15th anniversary of the Act's enactment.
Title
PROTECT SMOKE FREE IL ACT
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Ann Gillespie [D] |
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Doris Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Postponed - Health |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=51&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SJR/10200SJ0051.htm |