IL SJR0051 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Illinois Health Benefits Exchange Legislative Study Committee established by Public Act 97-0142 to study the utilization of a health benefits exchange in order to provide retiree health benefits for Medicare eligible former State employees.
Title
HEALTH BENEFITS EXCHANGE STUDY
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] | Rep. Frank Mautino [D] | Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] |
Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-07-27 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2012-05-01 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 011-002-000 |
2012-04-24 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2012-04-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2012-04-06 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2012-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-03-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 046-000-000 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions February 27, 2012 |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Be Adopted Insurance; 010-000-000 |
2012-02-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |