IL SJR0047 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Congress to pass H.R. 4052 to create a new national infrastructure bank to finance urgently needed infrastructure projects.
Title
NAT. INFRASTRUCTURE BANK ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 11, 2024 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Be Adopted Executive; 008-003-000 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=47&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SJR/10300SJ0047.htm |