IL SJR0043 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-10 - Resolution Adopted 105-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-10 - Resolution Adopted 105-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of I-72 between Decatur and Champaign as the "Officer Oberheim Memorial Highway".
Title
OFFICER OBERHEIM MEMORIAL HGWY
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Sen. Sally Turner [R] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] |
Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-10 - House - Motion in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-08 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | House | Resolution Adopted 105-000-000 |
2023-01-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-01-10 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000 |
2023-01-10 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2023-01-10 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2023-01-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-11-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-09 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-04-09 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 056-000-000 |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |