IL SJR0042 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of Ogden Avenue in Chicago that runs from South Pulaski Road to South Kedzie Avenue as the "Pastor Victor Rodriguez Avenue".
Title
PASTOR V. RODRIGUEZ AVE.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2020-01-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=42&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SJR/10100SJ0042.htm |