IL SJR0041 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the Illinois Community College Board and the Illinois Board of Higher Education to establish a joint advisory council to study how Illinois can maximize the number of students completing credit-bearing certificate programs and two-year or four-year degree programs and enter into high-skill, high-wage occupations and to develop a plan to increase those numbers.
Title
ICCB/IBHE JOINT COUNCIL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-30 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended 104-004-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2019-05-29 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 014-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-28 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Higher Education Committee; Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-28 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2019-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 055-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Be Adopted as Amended Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |