IL SJR0036 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-03 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
RESOLVED, BY THE SENATE OF THE NINETY-EIGHTH GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF ILLINOIS, THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES CONCURRING HEREIN, that when the two Houses adjourn on Thursday, May 02, 2013, the Senate stands adjourned until Monday, May 06, 2013 at 3:00 o'clock p.m., or until the call of the President; and the House of Representatives stands adjourned until Friday, May 03, 2013, and when it adjourns on that day, it stands adjourned until Tuesday, May 07, 2013, at 12:00 o'clock noon, or until the call of the Speaker.
Title
ADJOURN HOUSE & SENATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-03 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2013-05-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-02 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Resolution Adopted |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Prevailed to Suspend Rule 3-6(a) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Moved to Suspend Rule Sen. John M. Sullivan; 3-6(a) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=36&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SJR/09800SJ0036.htm |