IL SJR0022 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Rescinds Illinois' 1863 ratification of the Corwin Amendment to the United States Constitution.
Title
RESCIND-CORWIN AMENDMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution Adopted 115-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-04-08 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-04-07 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-04-07 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2022-04-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-04-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-06 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-04-06 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Be Adopted Executive; 017-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |