IL SJR0020 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-22 - Arrived in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-10-22 - Arrived in House
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Resolves to support the empowerment of Local School Councils as effective local, publicly-elected decision-making bodies in the City of Chicago and sponsor subject-matter hearings on the needs of Local School Councils to ensure their continued success.
Title
LOCAL SCHOOL COUNCILS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-22 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-06 | Resolution Adopted | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions March 6, 2009 | |
2009-03-05 | Be Adopted Education; 011-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Referred to Education | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with Secretary |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=20&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SJR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SJR/09600SJ0020.htm |