IL SJR0016 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates Illinois State Route 51 in Oconee in southwest Shelby County as the "ISP Special Agent Virgil Lee Bensyl Memorial Highway".
Title
AGENT BENSYL MEMORIAL HIGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Senate | Adopted Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2022-01-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 011-000-000 |
2022-01-11 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-06-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-06-08 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2021-06-08 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 054-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary |