IL SB4241 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-29 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-29 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Pawnbroker Regulation Act. Clarifies that it shall be unlawful for any pawnbroker to charge or collect a greater benefit or percentage upon money advanced, and for the use and forbearance thereof, than permitted under the Predatory Loan Prevention Act. Amends the Predatory Loan Prevention Act. Provides that the definition of "loan" includes transactions subject to the Pawnbroker Regulation Act. Provides that it is a violation of the Act for any person or entity to solicit, broker, or otherwise engage in any other activity intended to facilitate or result in, or that in fact facilitates or results in, the origination of a loan that violates the Act. Provides that it is a violation of the Act for any person or entity to advertise or cause to be advertised a loan that violates the Act. Provides that a violation of the Act by a person or entity licensed under the Pawnbroker Regulation Act shall subject the person or entity to discipline in accordance with that Act. Makes other changes. Effective June 1, 2023.
Title
PREDATORY LOANS-PAWNBROKERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-11-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Diane Pappas |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-11-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L Cervantes |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Doris Turner |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-11-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-11-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 510 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 123 | 15-1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 123 | 15-1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 123 | 15-10-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 123 | 15-5-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4241&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB4241.htm |