IL SB4190 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2022. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
$DCEO
Sponsors
Sen. Cristina Pacione-Zayas [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] | Sen. Mike Simmons [D] | Sen. Ram Villivalam [D] |
Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4190&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/PDF/10200SB4190.pdf |