IL SB4055 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health Early Action on Campus Act. Provides that the General Assembly shall appropriate $19,000,000 in Fiscal Year 2023 for the purposes of this Act. Provides that the funds shall be distributed to the public colleges and universities according to the recommendations of a specified report of the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability. Provides that the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability, in conjunction with the Illinois Community College Board and the Board of Higher Education, must make recommendations to the General Assembly on the amounts necessary to implement this Act for Fiscal Years 2024 through 2027, and may make such recommendations for Fiscal Years thereafter. Deletes provisions making the Act subject to appropriation. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
MENTAL HEALTH EARLY ACTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-02-01 | Senate | To Appropriations- Higher Education |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 58 | 55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4055&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB4055.htm |