IL SB4053 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0884
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0884
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Police and Chicago Firefighter Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that beginning January 1, 2023, the minimum widow's annuity shall be no less than 150% (rather than 125%) of the Federal Poverty Level for all persons receiving widow's annuities on or after that date, without regard to whether the deceased policeman or fireman is in service on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Makes a conforming change. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-CHI FIRE & POLICE-WIDOWS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0884 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date May 13, 2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-04-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-03-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 006-002-000 |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-02-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.46 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 5-167.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 6-128.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |