IL SB4000 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1090
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that for school years beginning on or after July 1, 2022 and before June 30, 2024, the service retirement pension shall not be cancelled in the case of a service retirement pensioner who is re-employed as a teacher or an administrator on a temporary and non-annual basis or on an hourly basis, so long as the person does not work as a teacher or an administrator for compensation on more than 140 days in a school year. Provides that for school years beginning on or after July 1, 2024, the service retirement pension shall not be cancelled in the case of a service retirement pensioner who is re-employed as a teacher or an administrator on a temporary and non-annual basis or on an hourly basis, so long as the person does not work as a teacher or an administrator for compensation on more than 120 days in a school year. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CTPF-REEMPLOYMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1090 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Effective Date June 10, 2022 |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-001 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Pensions; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Pensions |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mattie Hunter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 17-149 | Amended Code | Citation Text |