IL SB3961 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts concerning children by: replacing certain pronouns with the nouns to which the pronouns refer; replacing certain instances of the word "biological"; changing the Independent Juvenile Ombudsman to the Independent Juvenile Ombudsperson; deleting certain obsolete language; and making technical and other changes. Effective 60 days after becoming law.
Title
CHILDREN-PRONOUNS-REFERENCES
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Melinda Bush [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Cristina Castro [D] |
Sen. Ann Gillespie [D] | Sen. Cristina Pacione-Zayas [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Sen. Mike Simmons [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Postponed - Health |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3961&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB3961.htm |