IL SB3891 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In a provision concerning interest on support obligations, provides that, notwithstanding any cessation by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services of enforcement of interest on support obligations as the result of Public Act 101-336 and the rules adopted under it, the Department shall enforce interest on support obligations that become due and remain unpaid on and after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules to carry out the amendatory Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-CHILD SUPPORT INTEREST

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-02-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2022-02-09SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2022-02-01SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2022-01-21SenateReferred to Assignments
2022-01-21SenateFirst Reading
2022-01-21SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale Fowler

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
305510-16.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback