IL SB3833 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0861
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Expands the list of mandated reporters under the Act to include physical therapists, physical therapy assistants, occupational therapists, occupational therapy assistants, and athletic trainers.
Title
ANCRA-MANDATED REPORTERS
Sponsors
Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0861 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-001 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 007-000-000 |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-14 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2022 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |