IL SB3793 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Economic Opportunity Act. Provides that a Community Action Board shall consist of no less than 9 members (rather than 15 members) and no more than 51 members. Makes other changes.
Title
COMMUNITY ACTION BOARD-MEMBERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2024-05-17 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-01 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee; 007-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Economic Opportunity & Equity Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Adriane Johnson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 625 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |