IL SB3793 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly and State Employees Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, for members of the Illinois Senate, participation in the General Assembly Retirement System is restricted to those individuals who first become participants before the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that an individual who first becomes a member of the Illinois Senate on or after February 1, 2011 and before the effective date of the amendatory Act may become a member of the State Employees' Retirement System of Illinois by making an election to participate in that System. Provides that an individual who first becomes a member of the Illinois Senate on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall become a member of the State Employees' Retirement System of Illinois beginning on the date of becoming a member of the Illinois Senate unless, within 24 months from that date, he or she has filed with the board a written notice of election not to participate in that System. Effective immediately.
Title
GARS TO SERS FOR SENATORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Pensions and Investments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Darin M. LaHood |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3793&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB3793.htm |