IL SB3779 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1048
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clinical Social Work and Social Work Practice Act and the Good Samaritan Act. Provides that a licensed clinical social worker or licensed social worker may possess and administer opioid antagonists. Makes conforming changes. Provides that if a person employs a licensed clinical social worker or licensed social worker and the licensed clinical social worker or licensed social worker possess an opioid antagonist in a professional capacity, then the person must provide training in the administration of opioid antagonists and establish a policy to control the acquisition, storage, transportation, and administration of opioid antagonists. Makes other changes.
Title
SOCIAL WORK-OPIOID ANTAGONIST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-1048 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2024-05-17 | House | Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2024 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2024-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-05-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Public Health Committee; 008-000-000 |
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to Public Health Committee |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-15 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 20, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Karina Villa |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 20 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 10.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 12.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 32 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 20 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 20 | 8.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
745 | 49 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |