IL SB3776 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Blue Star Restaurant Program Act. Provides that the Department of Labor shall create the Blue Star Restaurant Program to recognize restaurants that voluntarily take no allowance for gratuities under the Minimum Wage Law. Provides for program eligibility requirements, benefits, and revocation of certification. Provides that the Department may adopt rules to implement and enforce the program. Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Provides that, from July 1, 2024 through June 30, 2026, the allowance for gratuities to which an employer is entitled for an employee engaged in an occupation in which gratuities have been recognized as part of the remuneration shall not exceed 20% of the applicable minimum wage rate. Provides that, on and after July 1, 2026, an employer shall not be entitled to an allowance for gratuities and shall pay each employee no less than the applicable minimum wage rate. Defines "interested party". Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Provides for additional notice requirements that employers must provide to employees who receive gratuities. Sets forth provisions concerning civil actions brought by an interested party. Amends the Illinois Wage Payment and Collection Act. Provides that no employer shall withhold from gratuities paid by credit card any credit card processing fees that the employer must pay in connection with the transaction. Provides that any service charge imposed by an employer on a customer shall be a gratuity and is the property of the employees. Effective immediately.
Title
MINIMUM WAGE-GRATUITIES
Sponsors
Sen. Lakesia Collins [D] | Sen. Javier Cervantes [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Rachel Ventura [D] |
Sen. Karina Villa [D] | Sen. Omar Aquino [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L. Cervantes |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Lakesia Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 105 | 12.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
820 | 105 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 105 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 105 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 115 | 4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3776&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3776.htm |