IL SB3761 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act. Renames the School Social Work Shortage Loan Repayment Program to School and Municipal Social Work Shortage Loan Repayment Program. Expands the Program to require the Illinois Student Assistance Commission to, each year, receive and consider applications from eligible social workers working for an Illinois municipality who do not report directly to a police department (now the Program only accepts applications from social workers who are employed by a public elementary or secondary school in this State) to encourage a grant recipient to use the financial assistance for the repayment of educational loans.
Title
HIGHER ED-SOCIAL WORKER-GRANT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1022 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-04-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-016-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-07 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Higher Education Committee; 010-005-000 |
2022-04-05 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2022-04-05 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-04-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-03-07 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-02-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 15, 2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 10, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ann Gillespie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 65.115 | Amended Code | Citation Text |