IL SB3758 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Carbon Dioxide Geologic Storage Act. Provides that a storage operator must have a reservoir permit issued by the Department of Natural Resources in order to operate a storage facility. Sets forth the requirements for the issuance of a reservoir permit, including the requirement that the storage operator has applied for, or has been issued, an Underground Injection Control (UIC) permit as authorized under the federal Safe Drinking Water Act's UIC Program. Provides that the Act applies only to certain carbon dioxide injections wells. Sets forth provisions concerning definitions, hearings, fees, inspections, ownership and conveyance of pore space, reservoir requirements, amalgamating property interests, mineral interests, title to carbon dioxide, liability, project completion, title transfer, enhanced recovery projects, and Memoranda of Understanding. Provides that the Department may adopt rules and issue orders to enforce the Act. Includes a severability clause.
Title
GEOLOGIC CO2 STORAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Energy |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2012-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Energy |
2012-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Energy |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |