IL SB3742 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Firearms Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
Pending: Senate Firearms Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that parole agents and supervisors who are terminated (rather than discharged) from employment of the Illinois Department of Corrections shall no longer be considered law enforcement officials and all their rights as law enforcement officials shall be revoked permanently. Provides that a State parole agent or supervisor retains the right to exercise the ability of off-duty status after retirement if the agent or supervisor seeks eligibility with the Retired Officer's Carry Conceal Program which is supervised by the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board. Defines "terminated". Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-PAROLE AGENT-TERMINATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024 |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-14-1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3742&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB3742.htm |