IL SB3655 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0937
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Passed on June 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0937
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Technology Development Act. Authorizes the State Treasurer to segregate up to 2% of the Treasurer's investment portfolio in the Technology Development Account IIa. Authorizes investments from the account to provide venture capital to help attract, assist, and retain quality technology businesses in Illinois. Contains provisions concerning soliciting proposals from entities to manage and be the General Partner of Technology Development Account IIb, consisting of investments from the private sector that must invest, at the direction of the Treasurer, in tandem with TDA IIa. Sets restrictions and conditions. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-TECHNOLOGY ACCOUNT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-06 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0937 | |
2010-06-23 | Effective Date June 23, 2010 | |
2010-06-23 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-04 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-06 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 | |
2010-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 010-000-000 | |
2010-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive | |
2010-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2010-05-06 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2010-05-06 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2010-05-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 6, 2010 | |
2010-05-06 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-05-06 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-05-05 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-05-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-05-05 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2010-05-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-05-05 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2010-04-28 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2010-04-28 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 7, 2010 | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-16 | First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-15 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-03-15 | Arrived in House | |
2010-03-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 045-000-000 | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2010-03-15 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Jacobs | |
2010-03-12 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Rutherford | |
2010-03-12 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 11, 2010 | |
2010-03-10 | Second Reading | |
2010-03-10 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2010 | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass Commerce; 009-000-000 | |
2010-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2010-02-24 | Assigned to Commerce | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-11 | First Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |