IL SB3638 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community-Integrated Living Arrangements Licensure and Certification Act. Provides that no later than January 1, 2021, the Department of Public Health shall adopt rules under the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to require remote monitoring and support services at community-integrated living arrangements. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services and the Department of Human Services to jointly submit the necessary application to the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services for a waiver or State Plan amendment to allow remote monitoring and support services as a waiver-reimbursable service for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities and seniors requiring in-home care. Provides that the application shall be submitted no later than 60 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
CILA-REMOTE MONITORING SRVCS
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Fine [D] | Sen. Dave Syverson [R] | Sen. Chapin Rose [R] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Sen. Heather Steans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 29, 2020 |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 22, 2020 |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 15, 2020 |
2020-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 30, 2020 |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading/Passage Deadline Established As May 7, 2020 |
2020-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2020 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 2, 2020 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 135 | 14.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 12-21.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |